THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:20:06 PM
Rodriguez Molares, Mercedes Cristina
CPSO#:
102089
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519)941-7060
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Sep 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MERCEDES CRISTINA RODRIGUEZ MOLARES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUEZ MOLARES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2015 |