THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:24:11 AM
Robert, Jennifer Anne
CPSO#:
102086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 57800
Fax: 905-358-3030
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Sep 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2015 |