THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:21:34 PM
Troscianczuk, Joanna Ewa
CPSO#:
102081
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
38-2130 North Park Dr
Brampton ON L6S 0C9
Phone: 9057922211
Fax: 9057922901
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Sep 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOANNA EWA TROSCIANCZUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROSCIANCZUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2013 to 22 Dec 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2015 |