THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:16:47 AM
Xu, Bin
CPSO#:
102042
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Bin Xu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Department of Pathology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 25 Jun 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
EL - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2019 |