THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:12:23 AM
Hashmatullah, Syed
CPSO#:
102007
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
01 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Syed Hashmatullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Pakistan
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2021 |