THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:08:56 PM
Punungwe, Rudo Pamela Tinoda
CPSO#:
102001
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Nov 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Nov 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Centre
545 Steeles Ave W
Brampton ON L6Y 4W5
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: 4163674301
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Nov 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Nov 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
|
Active |