THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:03:33 AM
Doyle, Sarah Victoria Marie
CPSO#:
101993
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
901 Bay St
Toronto ON M5S 3K6
Phone: 416-864-0722
Fax: 416-864-9742
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH VICTORIA MARIE DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2015 |