THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:45:17 PM
Oyefeso, Olumide
CPSO#:
101988
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Benin, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Rolling Hills Drive
Unit 5
Orangeville ON L9W 6T6
Phone: (519) 942-0404
Fax: (519) 942-0400
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Aug 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLUMIDE OYEFESO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYEFESO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 03 Dec 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2023 |