THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/09/24 21:05:34 PM
Montazeri Motlagh, Mohammad Reza
CPSO#:
101808
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Apr 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-250 Harding Blvd W
Richmond Hill ON L4C 9M7
Phone: 905-770-8480
Fax: 905-770-1813
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Montazeri Motlagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 25 2021
Corporation Name: Montazeri Motlagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 8 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD REZA MONTAZERI MOTLAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTAZERI MOTLAGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2016 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2024 |