THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:25:49 AM
Jewell, Kirsten Elizabeth
CPSO#:
101775
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville District Memorial Hospit
Emergency Department
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-0022
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Deep River and District Hospital |
Deep River |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:22 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN ELIZABETH JEWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
EL - Emergency Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2015 |