THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:51:50 PM
Mizubuti, Glenio Bitencourt
CPSO#:
101768
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Estadual de Londrina, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology and
Perioperative Medicine
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:10 Nov 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Apr 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Nov 2022 |
|
Active |