THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:23:56 PM
Helou, Joelle Antoine
CPSO#:
101687
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Sep 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: St. Joseph's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
LHSC Victoria hospital.
London ON N6A 5W9
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:16 Sep 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Sep 2013
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Sep 2016
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2024 |
|
Active |