THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:31:06 PM
Fricker, Kevin Daryl
CPSO#:
101519
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Mar 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1950 Algonquin Ave
Suite 205
North Bay ON P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 478-8080
Fax: 705 478-9090
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kevin Fricker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN DARYL FRICKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRICKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2016 |