THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 8:02:33 AM
Alshumrani, Mohamed Abdullah M
CPSO#:
101333
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 10 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |