THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:09:00 PM
Pilon, Sarah Jude
CPSO#:
101304
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Developmental Pediatrics |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH JUDE PILON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2019 |