THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:48:06 PM
Hosseini, Tahereh
CPSO#:
101244
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: Jahrom University of Medical Sciences, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137985555
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:31 Oct 2023 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TAHEREH HOSSEINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSSEINI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2016 to 18 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 19 Apr 2016 to 16 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 17 May 2016 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2016 |