THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:47:56 AM
Bacal, Vanessa
CPSO#:
101211
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Oct 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
700-250 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON M5G 2Z5
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 6590
Fax: 416-586-4686
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VANESSA BACAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 10 Jan 2023
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 May 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2020 |