THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 19:46:14 PM
Mason, Michael
CPSO#:
101197
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cottage Country Family Health Team
Bracebridge Medical Arts Centre
1-36 McDonald Street
Bracebridge ON P1L 2C2
Phone: (705)6452281
Fax: (705)6450057
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation |
Haliburton |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jul 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:13 Oct 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 2016 |