THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 6:10:45 AM
Matthies, Norah-Faye
CPSO#:
101191
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: 4166035110
Fax: 4166033437
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan A. Paul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
University Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NORAH-FAYE MATTHIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHIES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jul 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |