THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:37:01 PM
Bates, Christa Carol
CPSO#:
101185
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
123 3rd Avenue
Timmins Academic Family Health Team
Timmins ON P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Fax: (705) 268-7444
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2021 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTA CAROL BATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2021 |