THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:09:39 PM
Saleh, Philip
CPSO#:
101176
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3560 Bathurst St
North York ON M6A 2E1
Phone: 416-785-2500 Ext. 6197
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:25 Aug 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PHILIP SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2018 |