THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:11:54 PM
Wilson, Roselyn Marie
CPSO#:
101171
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West Niagara Mental Health
167 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P2
Phone: 905 3093336 Ext. 23
Fax: 9053094446
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital |
Grimsby |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Aug 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROSELYN MARIE WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Aug 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2018 |