THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 15:28:38 PM
Ravichandiran, Mayoorendra
CPSO#:
101159
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital General
Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAYOORENDRA RAVICHANDIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVICHANDIRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Aug 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
EL - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 03 Apr 2016
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Apr 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2016 |