THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 21:32:59 PM
Pek, Elisabeth Anna
CPSO#:
101115
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: University of Toronto, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
305-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: 416-446-0206
Fax: 613-724-3113
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:31 Dec 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELISABETH ANNA PEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2018 |