THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:45:06 PM
Russell, Sarah Ashley
CPSO#:
101101
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic-Campus
Department of Mental Health
D6
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 17588
Fax: 613-761-4177
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH ASHLEY RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |