THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:53:11 PM
Hawkes, Christine Marie
CPSO#:
101073
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology
EG 41
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100
Fax: 6477776121
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIE HAWKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWKES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neurology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |