THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:41:18 AM
Perrier, Catherine Elizabeth
CPSO#:
101015
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Lowes, Catherine Elizabeth (used until: 25 Jul 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dundas East Medical Centre
4-600 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5P9
Phone: (613) 779-8869
Fax: (613) 480-0255
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Mar 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH PERRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRIER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 30 Jan 2016 to 04 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2016 |