THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:13:52 PM
Dominguez, Rodolfo
CPSO#:
100999
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hillside Medical Centre
Unit 403
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-261-7223
Fax: 416-261-6374
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RODOLFO DOMINGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOMINGUEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2016 |