THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:04:20 AM
Reid, Heather Lynn
CPSO#:
100991
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
22 Moore St
Lions Head ON N0H 1W0
Phone: 5197933445
Fax: 5197934604
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site |
Lions Head |
North Shore Health Network |
Blind River |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNN REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 2015 |