THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:30:25 AM
Richter, Kristin Elizabeth
CPSO#:
100988
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
285 Bridge Street
Port Stanley ON N5L 1J5
Phone: (519) 782-4195
Fax: 519-782-3743
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Sep 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KRISTIN ELIZABETH RICHTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Jul 2013 to 25 Aug 2013
EL - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2015 |