THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:21:32 PM
Wiggers, John Bradley
CPSO#:
100969
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Positive Care Clinic
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Phone: 905-576-8711 Ext. 3127
Fax: 905-665-2409
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN BRADLEY WIGGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIGGERS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |