THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:10:03 PM
Khafaji, Hadi Abdulridha Hadi
CPSO#:
100859
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Apr 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Noble Medical & Diagnostics
107 - 3905 Major Mackenzie Dr
Woodbridge ON L4H 4J9
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:27 Apr 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 2013 to 08 Sep 2013
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Mar 2024 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Mar 2024 |
|
Active |