THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:20:59 PM
Mathew, Philip
CPSO#:
100822
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Calicut University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1310 Fewster Dr
Mississauga ON L4W 1A4
Phone: 905 282 1808
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
USA - Arizona
USA - Nebraska
USA - New Jersey
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jul 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jul 2017 |
|
Active |