THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:14:35 AM
Thomas, Jisha Michell
CPSO#:
100807
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: New York College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102-535 Mulock Dr
All Med Health
Newmarket ON L3Y 5H2
Phone: (905) 727-4241
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J M Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Medical Record Storage Company
1-888-563-3732 Ext 1
https://www.recordsolutions.ca/DrJThomas
Date Received: 04 Aug 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:06 Jun 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2015 |
|
Active |