THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:10:12 PM
Smulski, Stefanie Marie
CPSO#:
100805
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Sep 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:27 Sep 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Dec 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2023 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 01 Aug 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2023 |
|
Active |