THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:21:22 PM
Ellies, Vanessa A
CPSO#:
100803
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Nov 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Eye Specialists of Northern Ontario
107 Shirreff Avenue
Suite 204
North Bay ON P1B 7K8
Phone: 705-495-2212
Fax: 705-316-0888
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VANESSA A ELLIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 19 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2018 to 19 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 19 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 20 Aug 2019 to 19 Nov 2019
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 2019 |