THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:46:16 PM
Paventi Douglas, Alexandra Lindsay
CPSO#:
100795
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Nov 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
500 Church St
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Phone: 705-549-3181 Ext. 2442
Fax: 705-549-3778
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 Nov 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA LINDSAY PAVENTI DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAVENTI DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 09 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 09 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 09 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 08 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 09 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 11 Nov 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 May 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2019 |