THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:42:43 AM
Antiperovitch, Pavel
CPSO#:
100783
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
339 Windermere Rd #219
University Hospital - London Health
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:23 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAVEL ANTIPEROVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTIPEROVITCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 10 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 10 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 10 Mar 2017 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 May 2017 to 29 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 29 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 May 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 29 May 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2021 to 03 Jan 2022
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2018 |