THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:31:08 PM
Hahn, Ezra
CPSO#:
100776
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EZRA HAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAHN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 15 Sep 2019
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2019 |