THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 2:33:29 AM
Jakubovic, Baruch David
CPSO#:
100773
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
240 Duncan Mill Road
Suite 703
Toronto ON M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 944-8333
Fax: (416) 944-1582
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 Aug 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:04 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARUCH DAVID JAKUBOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAKUBOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2017 |