THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:52:27 AM
Lam, Ka Lo Carol
CPSO#:
100757
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-1500
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
OR
KidECare
301 - 491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto, ON M5N 1A5
Date Received: 03 Jun 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KA LO CAROL LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2021 |