THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:09:23 AM
Kwan, Sarah
CPSO#:
100732
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4-70 Forest Manor Rd
North York ON M2J 0A9
Phone: 647-499-2899
Fax: 416-479-3948
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Sep 2023 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Sep 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Sep 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |