THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:25:24 PM
Neata, Adelaida Iulia
CPSO#:
100693
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170-5 Fairview Mall Dr
North York ON M2J 2Z1
Phone: 416-447-5531
Fax: 416-447-5691
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADELAIDA IULIA NEATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEATA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 17 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2017 |