THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:35:05 AM
Kudlow, Paul Adam
CPSO#:
100691
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Psychiatry
FG47
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164804089
Fax: 4164805119
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Aug 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL ADAM KUDLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUDLOW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 18 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 11 Nov 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 18 Aug 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 05 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2022 |