THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:12:25 AM
Nica, Andra Iulia
CPSO#:
100681
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
699 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Cent
Gynecologic Oncology
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: 905 387 9495 Ext. 62492
Fax: 905 575 6343
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDRA IULIA NICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Nov 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Nov 2021
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2018 |