THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:09:51 AM
Lee, Benjamin Yin-Chiu
CPSO#:
100675
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21800
Fax: (416) 242-1058
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN YIN-CHIU LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2018 |