THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:50:25 AM
Joyce, Charles Russell
CPSO#:
100650
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941 7575
Fax: 519 941 7060
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Aug 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHARLES RUSSELL JOYCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYCE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2015 |