THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:04:57 PM
Ofori, Oyakhire Callistus
CPSO#:
100596
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: Obafemi Awolowo University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: O.C. Ofori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1577 25th Street
Bettendorf, IA 52722
Date Received: 23 May 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |