THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:42:47 AM
Trinacty, Jill Mary
CPSO#:
100578
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
4100 Strandherd Drive
Nepean ON K2J 0V2
Phone: (613) 505-9704
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Trinacty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:26 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JILL MARY TRINACTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINACTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |