THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:17:56 PM
Cummins, Graham James
CPSO#:
100560
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6420 Beatty Line North
Unit 204
Fergus ON N1M 2W3
Phone: 519-843-4380
Fax: 519-843-3211
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Sep 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GRAHAM JAMES CUMMINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2015 |